This version of the registration was submitted prior to the Lobbying Transparency Act coming into force on May 4, 2020. Due to different information requirements at that time, the registration is presented in the following format.
Registration ID: 23820450
Submitted by lobbyist on: April 30, 2015 09:59:57 AM
Accepted by Registrar on: April 30, 2015 01:01:55 PM
Lobbyist Information
Bailey, Mike Alvan |
660 475 West Georgia Street | |
Vancouver, BC, V7Y 4M9
|
604-684-2228 |
Canada |
BC Public Office Background
Public Office Title | Description of Role | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Political Staff | Executive Director to Premier Bill Bennett | 07/15/1983 | 03/15/1985 |
Political Staff | Executive Assistant to Premier Bill Bennett | 12/15/1980 | 07/15/1983 |
Lobbyist Firm Information
Western Policy Consultants Inc. |
660 - 475 West Georgia Street | |
Vancouver, BC, V7Y 4M9
|
604-684-2228 |
Canada |
Client Information
Cayoose Creek Development Corporation |
Cayoose Creek Development Corp. also owns subsidiary Splitrock Environmental, an award-winning aboriginal business specializing in environmental services, ecological restoration and propagation of native plants. |
PO BOX 736 | |
Lillooet, BC, V0K 1V0
|
250-256-7506 |
Canada |
Relevant Affiliates
The client has no relevant affiliates.
Government or Government Agency Funding
The organization does not receive any funding from a government or government agency.
Other Controlling or Directing Interests
The organization has no other controlling or directing interests.
Undertaking Information
April 30, 2015 | |
July 7, 2015 |
There are no other individuals engaged to lobby on this undertaking.
Lobbying Activities
Energy
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
Briefing Officials with regards to the Walden North Power Project
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Minister of Energy and Mines | May 27, 2015 | |
Minister | Bennett, Bill | Minister of Energy and Mines | April 30, 2015 |
Minister | Rustad, John | Minister of Aboriginal Relations and Reconciliation | April 30, 2015 |
MLA | Tegart, Jackie | Fraser-Nicola | April 30, 2015 |
Public Agency | Energy and Mines | April 30, 2015 |