This version of the registration was submitted prior to the Lobbying Transparency Act coming into force on May 4, 2020. Due to different information requirements at that time, the registration is presented in the following format.
Registration ID: 37685221
Submitted by lobbyist on: April 11, 2018 10:04:30 AM
Accepted by Registrar on: April 11, 2018 12:13:32 PM
Lobbyist Information
Lavigne, Brad |
319 West Hastings Street Suite 400 | |
Vancouver, BC, V6B 1H6
|
416-346-3801 |
Canada |
BC Public Office Background
Public Office Title | Description of Role | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Political Staff | Chief of staff to the Minister of Finance of the Province of British Columbia | 03/01/2000 | 12/29/2000 |
Political Staff | Ministerial assistant to British Columbia's Minister of Advanced Education | 10/01/1999 | 02/25/2000 |
Political Staff | Policy advisor in the Premier of British Columbia's Youth Office | 09/07/1998 | 09/30/1999 |
Lobbyist Firm Information
Counsel Public Affairs Inc. |
95 St. Clair Avenue West Suite 1606 | |
Toronto, ON, M4V 1N6
|
416-920-0716 |
Canada |
Client Information
Canopy Growth Corporation |
Canopy's vision is to be the number one cannabis company in the world. From product and process innovation to market execution and everything in between, Canopy is driven by a passion for leadership, a commitment to drive the industry forward, and above all else, providing medical and recreational cannabis consumers the best possible experience. |
1 Hershey Drive | |
Smiths Falls, ON, K7A 0A8
|
855-558-9333 |
Canada |
Relevant Affiliates
Government or Government Agency Funding
Name of Funding provider | Amount in CAD$ |
---|---|
National Sciences and Engineering Research Council, Collaborative Research and Development Grant | $790,498.00 |
Other Controlling or Directing Interests
Undertaking Information
April 5, 2018 | |
March 31, 2020 |
Other Individuals Engaged to Lobby
Bieber, David |
Parsons, Ben |
Lobbying Activities
Health
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
Development, establishment, amendment or termination of any program, policy or decision
Introduction, modification or repeal of legislation, a bill or regulation
Intermediary activities on behalf of client including arranging meetings with public office holders. Monitoring policies and programs at a general level and addressing issues as they arise related to the provincial cannabis regulatory framework.
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Ashbourne, Craig | Minister of Municipal Affairs and Housing | May 3, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Beale, William | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Darcy, Judy | Minister of Mental Health and Addictions | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Dix, Adrian | Minister of Health | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Donaldson, Doug | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Minister | Eby, David | Minister of Attorney General | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Farnworth, Mike | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | April 11, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Frampton, Caelie | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Girn, Naveen | Premier | August 15, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Godfrey, Sam | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Harder, Derrick | Minister of Attorney General | March 14, 2019 |
Minister | Heyman, George | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Hockin, Amber | Premier | August 21, 2019 |
Minister | Horgan, John | Premier | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | James, Carole | Minister of Finance | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Kahlon, Ravi | Parliamentary Secretary for Sport and Multiculturalism | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Maartman, Will | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | October 7, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | McNish, James | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | May 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | August 21, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Attorney General | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Mungall, Michelle | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Popham, Lana | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Ralston, Bruce | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Renneberg, Tim | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Sather, Kelly | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | April 30, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shaw, Mary | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | July 16, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shoemaker, Wes | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Sieben, Mark | Minister of Attorney General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Minister of Attorney General | September 20, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Premier | October 4, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Szabo, Maria | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Staff of Minister | Takkar, Nimmi | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Thomson, Krystal | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | van Baarsen, Amanda | Minister of Health | September 30, 2019 |
MLA | Ashton, Dan | Penticton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bains, Harry | Surrey-Newton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Barnett, Donna | Cariboo-Chilcotin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Beare, Lisa | Maple Ridge-Pitt Meadows | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Begg, Garry | Surrey-Guildford | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bernier, Mike | Peace River South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bond, Shirley | Prince George-Valemount | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Brar, Jagrup | Surrey-Fleetwood | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Cadieux, Stephanie | Surrey South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chandra Herbert, Spencer | Vancouver-West End | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chen, Katrina | Burnaby-Lougheed | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chouhan, Raj | Burnaby-Edmonds | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chow, George | Vancouver-Fraserview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Clovechok, Doug | Columbia River-Revelstoke | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Coleman, Rich | Langley East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Conroy, Katrine | Kootenay West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Darcy, Judy | New Westminster | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Davies, Dan | Peace River North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | de Jong, Mike | Abbotsford West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dean, Mitzi | Esquimalt-Metchosin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | D'Eith, Bob | Maple Ridge-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dix, Adrian | Vancouver-Kingsway | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Donaldson, Doug | Stikine | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Eby, David | Vancouver-Point Grey | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Elmore, Mable | Vancouver-Kensington | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Farnworth, Mike | Port Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fleming, Rob | Victoria-Swan Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Foster, Eric | Vernon-Monashee | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fraser, Scott | Mid Island-Pacific Rim | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Furstenau, Sonia | Cowichan Valley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Gibson, Simon | Abbotsford-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Glumac, Rick | Port Moody-Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Heyman, George | Vancouver-Fairview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Horgan, John | Langford-Juan de Fuca | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Hunt, Marvin | Surrey-Cloverdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Isaacs, Joan | Coquitlam-Burke Mountain | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | James, Carole | Victoria-Beacon Hill | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Johal, Jas | Richmond-Queensborough | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kahlon, Ravi | Delta North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kang, Anne | Burnaby-Deer Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Krog, Leonard | Nanaimo | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kyllo, Greg | Shuswap | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Larson, Linda | Boundary-Similkameen | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Lee, Michael | Vancouver-Langara | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Leonard, Ronna-Rae | Courtenay-Comox | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Letnick, Norm | Kelowna-Lake Country | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ma, Bowinn | North Vancouver-Lonsdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mark, Melanie | Vancouver-Mount Pleasant | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Martin, John | Chilliwack | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Milobar, Peter | Kamloops-North Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Morris, Mike | Prince George-Mackenzie | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mungall, Michelle | Nelson-Creston | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Oakes, Coralee | Cariboo North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Olsen, Adam | Saanich North and the Islands | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Paton, Ian | Delta South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Plecas, Darryl | Abbotsford South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Polak, Mary | Langley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Popham, Lana | Saanich South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ralston, Bruce | Surrey-Whalley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Redies, Tracy | Surrey-White Rock | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Reid, Linda | Richmond South Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rice, Jennifer | North Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Robinson, Selina | Coquitlam-Maillardville | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ross, Ellis | Skeena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routledge, Janet | Burnaby North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routley, Doug | Nanaimo-North Cowichan | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rustad, John | Nechako Lakes | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Shypitka, Tom | Kootenay East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simons, Nicholas | Powell River-Sunshine Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simpson, Shane | Vancouver-Hastings | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sims, Jinny | Surrey-Panorama | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Singh, Rachna | Surrey-Green Timbers | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stilwell, Michelle | Parksville-Qualicum | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stone, Todd | Kamloops-South Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sturdy, Jordan | West Vancouver-Sea to Sky | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sullivan, Sam | Vancouver-False Creek | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sultan, Ralph | West Vancouver-Capilano | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Tegart, Jackie | Fraser-Nicola | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thomson, Steve | Kelowna-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thornthwaite, Jane | North Vancouver-Seymour | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Throness, Laurie | Chilliwack-Kent | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Trevena, Claire | North Island | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wat, Teresa | Richmond North Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Weaver, Andrew | Oak Bay-Gordon Head | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wilkinson, Andrew | Vancouver-Quilchena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Yap, John | Richmond-Steveston | April 11, 2018 |
Public Agency | Provincial Health Services Authority | May 13, 2019 | |
Public Agency | Public Safety and Solicitor General | April 8, 2019 |
Small Business
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
Development, establishment, amendment or termination of any program, policy or decision
Introduction, modification or repeal of legislation, a bill or regulation
Intermediary activities on behalf of client including arranging meetings with public office holders. Monitoring policies and programs at a general level and addressing issues as they arise related to the provincial cannabis regulatory framework.
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Ashbourne, Craig | Minister of Municipal Affairs and Housing | May 3, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Beale, William | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Dix, Adrian | Minister of Health | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Donaldson, Doug | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Frampton, Caelie | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Girn, Naveen | Premier | August 15, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Godfrey, Sam | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Harder, Derrick | Minister of Attorney General | March 14, 2019 |
Minister | Heyman, George | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Hockin, Amber | Premier | August 21, 2019 |
Minister | Horgan, John | Premier | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | James, Carole | Minister of Finance | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Kahlon, Ravi | Parliamentary Secretary for Sport and Multiculturalism | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Maartman, Will | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | October 7, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | McNish, James | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | May 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | August 21, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Attorney General | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Mungall, Michelle | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Popham, Lana | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Ralston, Bruce | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Renneberg, Tim | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Sather, Kelly | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | April 30, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shaw, Mary | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | July 16, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shoemaker, Wes | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Sieben, Mark | Minister of Attorney General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Minister of Attorney General | September 20, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Premier | October 4, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Szabo, Maria | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Staff of Minister | Takkar, Nimmi | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Thomson, Krystal | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | van Baarsen, Amanda | Minister of Health | September 30, 2019 |
MLA | Ashton, Dan | Penticton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bains, Harry | Surrey-Newton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Barnett, Donna | Cariboo-Chilcotin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Beare, Lisa | Maple Ridge-Pitt Meadows | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Begg, Garry | Surrey-Guildford | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bernier, Mike | Peace River South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bond, Shirley | Prince George-Valemount | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Brar, Jagrup | Surrey-Fleetwood | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Cadieux, Stephanie | Surrey South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chandra Herbert, Spencer | Vancouver-West End | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chen, Katrina | Burnaby-Lougheed | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chouhan, Raj | Burnaby-Edmonds | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chow, George | Vancouver-Fraserview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Clovechok, Doug | Columbia River-Revelstoke | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Coleman, Rich | Langley East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Conroy, Katrine | Kootenay West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Darcy, Judy | New Westminster | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Davies, Dan | Peace River North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | de Jong, Mike | Abbotsford West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dean, Mitzi | Esquimalt-Metchosin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | D'Eith, Bob | Maple Ridge-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dix, Adrian | Vancouver-Kingsway | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Donaldson, Doug | Stikine | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Eby, David | Vancouver-Point Grey | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Elmore, Mable | Vancouver-Kensington | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Farnworth, Mike | Port Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fleming, Rob | Victoria-Swan Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Foster, Eric | Vernon-Monashee | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fraser, Scott | Mid Island-Pacific Rim | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Furstenau, Sonia | Cowichan Valley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Gibson, Simon | Abbotsford-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Glumac, Rick | Port Moody-Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Heyman, George | Vancouver-Fairview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Horgan, John | Langford-Juan de Fuca | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Hunt, Marvin | Surrey-Cloverdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Isaacs, Joan | Coquitlam-Burke Mountain | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | James, Carole | Victoria-Beacon Hill | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Johal, Jas | Richmond-Queensborough | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kahlon, Ravi | Delta North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kang, Anne | Burnaby-Deer Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Krog, Leonard | Nanaimo | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kyllo, Greg | Shuswap | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Larson, Linda | Boundary-Similkameen | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Lee, Michael | Vancouver-Langara | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Leonard, Ronna-Rae | Courtenay-Comox | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Letnick, Norm | Kelowna-Lake Country | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ma, Bowinn | North Vancouver-Lonsdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mark, Melanie | Vancouver-Mount Pleasant | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Martin, John | Chilliwack | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Milobar, Peter | Kamloops-North Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Morris, Mike | Prince George-Mackenzie | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mungall, Michelle | Nelson-Creston | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Oakes, Coralee | Cariboo North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Olsen, Adam | Saanich North and the Islands | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Paton, Ian | Delta South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Plecas, Darryl | Abbotsford South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Polak, Mary | Langley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Popham, Lana | Saanich South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ralston, Bruce | Surrey-Whalley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Redies, Tracy | Surrey-White Rock | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Reid, Linda | Richmond South Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rice, Jennifer | North Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Robinson, Selina | Coquitlam-Maillardville | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ross, Ellis | Skeena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routledge, Janet | Burnaby North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routley, Doug | Nanaimo-North Cowichan | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rustad, John | Nechako Lakes | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Shypitka, Tom | Kootenay East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simons, Nicholas | Powell River-Sunshine Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simpson, Shane | Vancouver-Hastings | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sims, Jinny | Surrey-Panorama | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Singh, Rachna | Surrey-Green Timbers | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stilwell, Michelle | Parksville-Qualicum | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stone, Todd | Kamloops-South Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sturdy, Jordan | West Vancouver-Sea to Sky | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sullivan, Sam | Vancouver-False Creek | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sultan, Ralph | West Vancouver-Capilano | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Tegart, Jackie | Fraser-Nicola | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thomson, Steve | Kelowna-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thornthwaite, Jane | North Vancouver-Seymour | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Throness, Laurie | Chilliwack-Kent | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Trevena, Claire | North Island | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wat, Teresa | Richmond North Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Weaver, Andrew | Oak Bay-Gordon Head | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wilkinson, Andrew | Vancouver-Quilchena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Yap, John | Richmond-Steveston | April 11, 2018 |
Public Agency | Provincial Health Services Authority | May 13, 2019 | |
Public Agency | Public Safety and Solicitor General | April 8, 2019 |
Taxation and Finance
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
Development, establishment, amendment or termination of any program, policy or decision
Introduction, modification or repeal of legislation, a bill or regulation
Intermediary activities on behalf of client including arranging meetings with public office holders. Monitoring policies and programs at a general level and addressing issues as they arise related to the provincial cannabis regulatory framework.
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Ashbourne, Craig | Minister of Municipal Affairs and Housing | May 3, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Beale, William | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Dix, Adrian | Minister of Health | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Donaldson, Doug | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Frampton, Caelie | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Girn, Naveen | Premier | August 15, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Godfrey, Sam | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Harder, Derrick | Minister of Attorney General | March 14, 2019 |
Minister | Heyman, George | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Hockin, Amber | Premier | August 21, 2019 |
Minister | Horgan, John | Premier | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | James, Carole | Minister of Finance | April 11, 2018 |
Minister | Kahlon, Ravi | Parliamentary Secretary for Sport and Multiculturalism | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Maartman, Will | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | October 7, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | McNish, James | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | May 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | August 21, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Milne, Gala | Minister of Attorney General | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Mungall, Michelle | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Minister | Popham, Lana | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Minister | Ralston, Bruce | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Renneberg, Tim | Minister of Forests, Lands, Natural Resource Operations, and Rural Development | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Sather, Kelly | Minister of Environment and Climate Change Strategy | April 30, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shaw, Mary | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | July 16, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Shoemaker, Wes | Minister of Agriculture | March 13, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Sieben, Mark | Minister of Attorney General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Minister of Attorney General | September 20, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Smith, George | Premier | October 4, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | Szabo, Maria | Minister of Jobs, Economic Development and Competitiveness | February 6, 2020 |
Staff of Minister | Takkar, Nimmi | Minister of Public Safety and Solicitor General | September 26, 2018 |
Staff of Minister | Thomson, Krystal | Minister of Jobs, Trade and Technology | August 1, 2019 |
Staff of Minister | van Baarsen, Amanda | Minister of Health | September 30, 2019 |
MLA | Ashton, Dan | Penticton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bains, Harry | Surrey-Newton | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Barnett, Donna | Cariboo-Chilcotin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Beare, Lisa | Maple Ridge-Pitt Meadows | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Begg, Garry | Surrey-Guildford | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bernier, Mike | Peace River South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Bond, Shirley | Prince George-Valemount | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Brar, Jagrup | Surrey-Fleetwood | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Cadieux, Stephanie | Surrey South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chandra Herbert, Spencer | Vancouver-West End | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chen, Katrina | Burnaby-Lougheed | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chouhan, Raj | Burnaby-Edmonds | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Chow, George | Vancouver-Fraserview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Clovechok, Doug | Columbia River-Revelstoke | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Coleman, Rich | Langley East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Conroy, Katrine | Kootenay West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Darcy, Judy | New Westminster | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Davies, Dan | Peace River North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | de Jong, Mike | Abbotsford West | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dean, Mitzi | Esquimalt-Metchosin | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | D'Eith, Bob | Maple Ridge-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Dix, Adrian | Vancouver-Kingsway | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Donaldson, Doug | Stikine | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Eby, David | Vancouver-Point Grey | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Elmore, Mable | Vancouver-Kensington | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Farnworth, Mike | Port Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fleming, Rob | Victoria-Swan Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Foster, Eric | Vernon-Monashee | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Fraser, Scott | Mid Island-Pacific Rim | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Furstenau, Sonia | Cowichan Valley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Gibson, Simon | Abbotsford-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Glumac, Rick | Port Moody-Coquitlam | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Heyman, George | Vancouver-Fairview | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Horgan, John | Langford-Juan de Fuca | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Hunt, Marvin | Surrey-Cloverdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Isaacs, Joan | Coquitlam-Burke Mountain | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | James, Carole | Victoria-Beacon Hill | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Johal, Jas | Richmond-Queensborough | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kahlon, Ravi | Delta North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kang, Anne | Burnaby-Deer Lake | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Krog, Leonard | Nanaimo | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Kyllo, Greg | Shuswap | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Larson, Linda | Boundary-Similkameen | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Lee, Michael | Vancouver-Langara | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Leonard, Ronna-Rae | Courtenay-Comox | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Letnick, Norm | Kelowna-Lake Country | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ma, Bowinn | North Vancouver-Lonsdale | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mark, Melanie | Vancouver-Mount Pleasant | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Martin, John | Chilliwack | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Milobar, Peter | Kamloops-North Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Morris, Mike | Prince George-Mackenzie | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Mungall, Michelle | Nelson-Creston | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Oakes, Coralee | Cariboo North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Olsen, Adam | Saanich North and the Islands | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Paton, Ian | Delta South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Plecas, Darryl | Abbotsford South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Polak, Mary | Langley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Popham, Lana | Saanich South | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ralston, Bruce | Surrey-Whalley | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Redies, Tracy | Surrey-White Rock | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Reid, Linda | Richmond South Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rice, Jennifer | North Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Robinson, Selina | Coquitlam-Maillardville | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Ross, Ellis | Skeena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routledge, Janet | Burnaby North | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Routley, Doug | Nanaimo-North Cowichan | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Rustad, John | Nechako Lakes | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Shypitka, Tom | Kootenay East | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simons, Nicholas | Powell River-Sunshine Coast | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Simpson, Shane | Vancouver-Hastings | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sims, Jinny | Surrey-Panorama | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Singh, Rachna | Surrey-Green Timbers | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stilwell, Michelle | Parksville-Qualicum | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Stone, Todd | Kamloops-South Thompson | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sturdy, Jordan | West Vancouver-Sea to Sky | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sullivan, Sam | Vancouver-False Creek | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Sultan, Ralph | West Vancouver-Capilano | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Tegart, Jackie | Fraser-Nicola | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thomson, Steve | Kelowna-Mission | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Thornthwaite, Jane | North Vancouver-Seymour | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Throness, Laurie | Chilliwack-Kent | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Trevena, Claire | North Island | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wat, Teresa | Richmond North Centre | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Weaver, Andrew | Oak Bay-Gordon Head | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Wilkinson, Andrew | Vancouver-Quilchena | April 11, 2018 |
MLA | Yap, John | Richmond-Steveston | April 11, 2018 |
Public Agency | Provincial Health Services Authority | May 13, 2019 | |
Public Agency | Public Safety and Solicitor General | April 8, 2019 |