This version of the registration was submitted prior to the Lobbying Transparency Act coming into force on May 4, 2020. Due to different information requirements at that time, the registration is presented in the following format.
Registration ID: 18020061
Submitted by lobbyist on: November 1, 2013 12:00:00 AM
Accepted by Registrar on: November 1, 2013 08:14:55 AM
Lobbyist Information
Pantazopoulos, Dimitri |
999 Canada Place Suite 520 | |
Vancouver, BC, V6C 3E2
|
778-588-6222 |
Canada |
BC Public Office Background
Public Office Title | Description of Role | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister | Assistant Deputy Minister, Intergovernmental Relations and Trade Reported to DM Intergovernmental Relations. Responsible for Federal-Provincial and Interprovincial Relations and Coordination of Trade Missions | 02/15/2012 | 05/22/2013 |
Political Staff | Principal Secretary to the Premier | 04/04/2011 | 02/14/2012 |
Lobbyist Firm Information
Maple Leaf Strategies, Inc. |
999 Canada Place Suite 520 | |
Vancouver, BC, V6C 3E2
|
778-588-6222 |
Canada |
Client Information
Woodside Energy |
Australian petroleum exploration and production company |
240 St Georges Terrace Woodside Plaza 6000 | |
Perth WA, ,
|
|
???jsp.global.country.??? |
Relevant Affiliates
Government or Government Agency Funding
Other Controlling or Directing Interests
Undertaking Information
October 31, 2013 | |
February 23, 2016 |
Other Individuals Engaged to Lobby
Dick, Carling |
Quaiattini, Gordon |
Lobbying Activities
Energy
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
Awarding, amendment or termination of a contract, grant or financial benefit
Development, establishment, amendment or termination of any program, policy or decision
Exploring LNG opportunities in BC with the potential for investment in the region in the future.
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Minister of Energy and Mines | October 31, 2013 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister Responsible for Housing | October 31, 2013 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister of Finance | October 31, 2013 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister of Environment | October 31, 2013 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister of Aboriginal Relations and Reconciliation | October 31, 2013 | |
Minister | Bennett, Bill | Minister of Energy and Mines | October 31, 2013 |
Minister | Coleman, Rich | Minister Responsible for Housing | October 31, 2013 |
Minister | de Jong, Mike | Minister of Finance | October 31, 2013 |
Minister | Polak, Mary | Minister of Environment | October 31, 2013 |
Minister | Rustad, John | Minister of Aboriginal Relations and Reconciliation | October 31, 2013 |
Public Agency | Natural Gas Development | February 5, 2014 | |
Public Agency | Office of the Premier | July 16, 2014 |