This version of the registration was submitted prior to the Lobbying Transparency Act coming into force on May 4, 2020. Due to different information requirements at that time, the registration is presented in the following format.
Registration ID: 23174454
Submitted by lobbyist on: March 6, 2015 02:34:28 PM
Accepted by Registrar on: March 11, 2015 01:24:57 PM
Lobbyist Information
Scott, Rebecca |
Suite 1650 999 W.Hastings St | |
Vancouver, BC, V6C 2W2
|
604-202-5251 |
Canada |
BC Public Office Background
Public Office Title | Description of Role | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Political Staff | Public Affairs Officer, GCPE | 05/10/2012 | 01/20/2015 |
Political Staff | Deputy Press Secretary and Communications Coodinator, Premier's Office | 03/14/2011 | 05/09/2012 |
Lobbyist Firm Information
Global Public Affairs |
Suite 1650 999 W.Hastings St | |
Vancouver, BC, V6C 2W2
|
604-202-5251 |
Canada |
Client Information
CSA Group |
The Canadian Standards Association (CSA), is a not-for-profit standards organization which develops standards in 57 areas. CSA publishes standards in print and electronic form and provides training and advisory services. CSA is composed of representatives from industry, government, and consumer groups. The CSA registered mark shows that a product has been independently tested and certified to meet recognized standards for safety or performance. |
178 Rexdale Blvd | |
Toronto, ON, M9W 1R3
|
416-747-4000 |
Canada |
Relevant Affiliates
The client has no relevant affiliates.
Government or Government Agency Funding
The organization does not receive any funding from a government or government agency.
Other Controlling or Directing Interests
The organization has no other controlling or directing interests.
Undertaking Information
March 6, 2015 | |
April 30, 2015 |
There are no other individuals engaged to lobby on this undertaking.
Lobbying Activities
Non-Profit Organization
Arranging meeting between an individual and a public office holder
To inform public officials about CSA Group's services and products.
Target Contacts
Target Type | Name | Title or Constituency | Date Added |
---|---|---|---|
Staff of Minister | Minister of Jobs, Tourism and Skills Training | March 6, 2015 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister of Natural Gas Development | March 6, 2015 | |
Staff of Minister | Minister of Environment | March 6, 2015 | |
Minister | Bernier, Mike | Parliamentary Secretary for Energy Literacy and the Environment for the Min of Env | March 6, 2015 |
Public Agency | Environment | March 6, 2015 | |
Public Agency | Jobs, Tourism and Skills Training | March 6, 2015 | |
Public Agency | Natural Gas Development | March 6, 2015 | |
Public Agency | Oil and Gas Commission | March 6, 2015 |